This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/16/2022 at 15:46:17 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS BELL, SHERRY A

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BELL, SHERRY A. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

BELL, SHERRY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVAREZ, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

02/14/2022:COVER SHEET

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/14/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/14/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: SHERRY BELL 3/24/22 @ 9AM

02/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: SHERRY BELL 3/24/22 @ 9AM

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/28/2022:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

02/28/2022:CLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

 

Docket Entries

02/28/2022

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- RECORD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: SHERRY BELL 3/24/22 @ 9AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 192508

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000111SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less