This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 12/01/2021 at 05:29:03 (UTC).

CANNONE, BRANDEN, CANNONE, CHASE Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 CANNONE, BRANDEN, CANNONE, CHASE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CANNONE, NANCY

CANNONE, BRANDEN

Not Classified By Court

CANNONE, CHASE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MURALT, LINDA C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/28/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2021

DocketORDER- RECORD GRANTING PETITION FOR AUTHORITY TO SETTLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 6/28/21 130PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketPETITION: FOR AUTHORITY TO SETTLE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketPayment received: $231.00 Receipt Number YX 178698

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $231.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2021

DocketCase 452021GA000016GAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less