This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 10/19/2022 at 16:35:42 (UTC).

BUCHAN, JODY C VS BUCHAN, TAMELA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 BUCHAN, JODY C filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BUCHAN, TAMELA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUCHAN, JODY C

Respondent

BUCHAN, TAMELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHAYNE, GORDON NELSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2022

DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER: TAMELA BUCHAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketANSWER: WIFE'S TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: TAMELA BUCHAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketNOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE: TAMELA BUCHAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE: WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TAMELA BUCHAN 09/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: TAMELA BUCHAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2022

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 202950

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
09/20/2022

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: GORDON N SHAYNE, ESQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TAMELA BUCHAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2022

DocketCase 452022DR000813DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/19/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less