This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:22:58 (UTC).

BRYANT, AMANDA MICHELLE VS BRYANT, MATTHEW KYLE

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 BRYANT, AMANDA MICHELLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRYANT, MATTHEW KYLE. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERSON, ERIC C and ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERSON, ERIC C

ROBERSON, ERIC CHASE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRYANT, AMANDA MICHELLE

Respondent

BRYANT, MATTHEW KYLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketJudge: ROBERSON , ERIC C Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF THIRD REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SECOND REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRST REVIEW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE: AMANDA BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT:AMANDA BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: AMANDA BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER: AMANDA MICHELLE BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUCCJ AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT: OF MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS: TIME-SHARING, AND OTHER RELIEF WITH DEPENDANT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000766DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less