This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 14:05:03 (UTC).

BORAKOVE, FRED VS VOYAGERS

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 BORAKOVE, FRED filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VOYAGERS. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BORAKOVE, FRED

Defendant

VOYAGERS

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ENTREPENEUR LAW CENTER

04/28/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ENTREPENEUR LAW CENTER

CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSIGNED

03/11/2020:CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSIGNED

SUMMONS ISSUED: ENTREPRENEUR LAW

03/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: ENTREPRENEUR LAW

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

02/10/2020:CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED: ENTERPRENEUR LAW

02/06/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED: ENTERPRENEUR LAW

AMENDED SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/06/2020:AMENDED SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

02/06/2020:AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AMENDED NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

02/06/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

AMENDED STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

02/06/2020:AMENDED STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

AMENDED PROOF OF CLAIM

02/06/2020:AMENDED PROOF OF CLAIM

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: VOYAGERS

02/04/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED: VOYAGERS

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

12/20/2019:CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED: VOYAGERS

12/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: VOYAGERS

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

12/18/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

12/18/2019:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

PROOF OF CLAIM

12/18/2019:PROOF OF CLAIM

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/18/2019:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: ENTREPENEUR LAW CENTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ENTREPRENEUR LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 161997

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2020

DocketAssessment 6 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: ENTERPRENEUR LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020

DocketPayment received: $24.60 Receipt Number YX 159872

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
12/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019

DocketPayment received: $317.30 Receipt Number YX 157030

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019

DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000638SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/18/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less