This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:38:26 (UTC).

BOPP, SHARON A. VS BOPP, WILLIAM F.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 BOPP, SHARON A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOPP, WILLIAM F. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, LESTER BERNARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOPP, SHARON A.

Respondent

BOPP, WILLIAM F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GREENE, JODY ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/14/2021

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2021

DocketCLOSING FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2021

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: BY REMOTE APPEARANCE 12/14/21 9:30AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: WILLIAM BOPP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2021

DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT: SHARON BOPP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2021

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: WILLIAM F BOPP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2021

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED WILLIAM F. BOPP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2021

DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 186932

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2021

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE: WIFE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 186851

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021

DocketCase 452021DR000927DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/29/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less