This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/30/2019 at 13:30:37 (UTC).

BOATRIGHT, QUINCY VS ALTMAN, MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 BOATRIGHT, QUINCY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALTMAN, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOATRIGHT, QUINCY

Defendants

ALTMAN, MICHAEL

COISON, MAEGAN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

09/06/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL ALTMAN

09/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL ALTMAN

MAEGAN COISON

09/06/2019:MAEGAN COISON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKAGE

09/06/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKAGE

EVICTION COMPLAINT

09/06/2019:EVICTION COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MAEGAN COISON 9/9/19

09/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MAEGAN COISON 9/9/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL ALTMAN 9/9/19

09/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL ALTMAN 9/9/19

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

09/18/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

09/18/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

09/19/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

09/24/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION

 

Docket Entries

09/24/2019
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2019
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHAEL ALTMAN 9/9/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MAEGAN COISON 9/9/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: MAEGAN COISON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHAEL ALTMAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019

DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number YX 150414

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019

DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000337CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less