This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 13:25:05 (UTC).

BETTERIDGE, LINDSAY VS DAVENPORT, JACK

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BETTERIDGE, LINDSAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVENPORT, JACK. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and WESLEY POOLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

WESLEY POOLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETTERIDGE, LINDSAY

Defendant

DAVENPORT, JACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

O'CONNER, JAMES PRATT

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT: OF CLAIM

12/06/2019:STATEMENT: OF CLAIM

PROOF OF CLAIM

12/06/2019:PROOF OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

12/06/2019:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

NOTICE OF: PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

12/06/2019:NOTICE OF: PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/06/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED: JACK DAVENPORT JR.

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: JACK DAVENPORT JR.

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JACK DAVENPORT JR. 12/16/2019

12/31/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JACK DAVENPORT JR. 12/16/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

01/24/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/24/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS

AFFIDAVIT:

01/24/2020:AFFIDAVIT:

ORDER SETTING HEARING

01/28/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION CONTINUED

01/28/2020:OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION CONTINUED

CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/31/2020:CLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/31/2020

HearingEvent Date: 01/31/2020 11:00; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: MOT; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: O'Conner, James Pratt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2020

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

HearingEvent Date: 01/28/2020 09:30; Judge: POOLE, WESLEY R; Docket Type: SCM; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX JUDGE; Defendant Attorney: O'Conner, James Pratt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION CONTINUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020

DocketEvent MOT scheduled on 1/31/2020 at 1100 AM, YX - Judge WESLEY POOLE presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2020
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
12/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JACK DAVENPORT JR.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF: PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT: OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019

DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number YX 156227

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019

DocketJudge: POOLE , WESLEY R Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2019

DocketCase 452019SC000597SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less