This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 05/16/2022 at 14:18:27 (UTC).

BESSEMER TRUST COMPANY OF FLOR, PROCKOW, IHOR ERIC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 BESSEMER TRUST COMPANY OF FLOR, PROCKOW, IHOR ERIC was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL, JAMES HUNT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BESSEMER TRUST COMPANY OF FLOR

Decedent

PROCKOW, IHOR ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

KANE, KEVIN ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EXTENSION FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EXTENSION FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 185232

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase 452021CP000360CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BESSEMER TRUST COMPANY OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANE, KEVIN ANDREW