This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/16/2022 at 16:40:06 (UTC).

BERGSTROM, RUTH DEL CARMEN VS BERGSTROM, GREGORY KENT

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 BERGSTROM, RUTH DEL CARMEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BERGSTROM, GREGORY KENT. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BASS, LESTER B, BASS, LESTER BERNARD and ROBERT FOSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BASS, LESTER B

BASS, LESTER BERNARD

ROBERT FOSTER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERGSTROM, RUTH DEL CARMEN

Respondent

BERGSTROM, GREGORY KENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/10/2022

DocketEvent PROSE scheduled on 3/21/2022 at 0145 PM, YX - Judge ROBERT FOSTER presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2022

DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING: MARCH 21, 22 01:55 PM VIA ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketJudge: BASS , LESTER B Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: GREGORY K. BERGSTROM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE: RUGHT D. BERGSTROM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER: RUTH D. BERGSTROM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER: GREGORY K. BERGSTROM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketMARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number YX 192462

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022

DocketCase 452022DR000130DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 2/14/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less