This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 09/17/2021 at 16:46:17 (UTC).

BEATY, JOHN DAVID VS HORSEMAN, ANTHONY JOHN

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 BEATY, JOHN DAVID filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HORSEMAN, ANTHONY JOHN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL, JAMES HUNT, JAMES DANIEL and DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL, JAMES HUNT

JAMES DANIEL

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEATY, JOHN DAVID

Respondent

HORSEMAN, ANTHONY JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANTHONY HORSEMAN 9/1/21 IN COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JOHN BEATY 9/1/21 IN COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S): P1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDV CLOSING ORDER DENYING PET INJ- RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: A HORSEMAN 08/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketEvent DV scheduled on 9/1/2021 at 0830 AM, YX - Judge JAMES DANIEL presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF INJUNCTION PROCEDURES AND COURT DATE & TIME- 9/1/21 @ 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDV PETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase 452021DR000777DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 8/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketJudge: DANIEL , JAMES H assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lufrano, Matthew Ian