This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/20/2019 at 18:22:08 (UTC).

BEACH WOOD VILLAS ASSOCIATION VS WACHOVIA BANK NA

Case Summary

On 06/20/2012 BEACH WOOD VILLAS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against WACHOVIA BANK NA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POOLE, WESLEY R and POOLE, WESLEY R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POOLE, WESLEY R

POOLE, WESLEY R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEACH WOOD VILLAS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

WACHOVIA BANK NA

Not Classified By Court

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMASSETTI, ARMOND JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/27/2014

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2014

DocketCLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2014

DocketJudge: POOLE , WESLEY R. Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2014

DocketNOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2012

DocketCANCELLATION OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2012

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING: 11/28/2012 11:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2012

DocketAMENDED: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND IN SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2012

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2012

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2012

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
07/26/2012

DocketAssessment 2062003 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

DocketAssessment 2062003 assessed at sum $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2012

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2012

DocketSUMMONS SERVED:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2012

DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2012

DocketASM: SUMMONS ISSUED SC CC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2012

DocketOPN: COMPLAINT REAL PROPERTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2012

DocketSCANNED DOCUMENT OPEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2012

DocketNOT: OF LIS PENDENS REC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2012

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less