This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/19/2019 at 13:30:49 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS RAMSEY, BARBARA

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed an Other lawsuit against RAMSEY, BARBARA. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

RAMSEY, BARBARA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/25/2019:COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

06/25/2019:COVER SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

06/25/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/25/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BARBARA RAMSEY

06/25/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BARBARA RAMSEY

SUMMONS ISSUED: BARBARA RAMSEY

06/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: BARBARA RAMSEY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/08/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BARBARA RAMSEY

07/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BARBARA RAMSEY

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

07/11/2019:NOTICE TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/12/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/15/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

07/17/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/17/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/17/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2019
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BARBARA RAMSEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: BARBARA RAMSEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 146202

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BARBARA RAMSEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000255CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/25/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less