Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/19/2019 at 17:31:50 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SIEBERT, ROBERT J Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A , SIEBERT, ROBERT J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FAHLGREN, STEVEN M and DANIEL, JAMES H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

DANIEL, JAMES H

 

Party Details

Decedent

SIEBERT, ROBERT J

Not Classified By Court

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

TRUDEAU, ROBERT H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • Compliance PRBLET has been created with due date of 10/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Judge: DANIEL , JAMES H Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • WAIVER PETER SIEBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • WAIVER DOROTHY SIEBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 151794

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 452019CP000357CPAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant