This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/07/2020 at 13:35:35 (UTC).

AXIS PLEX 1 LLC VS SCARLETT, ASHLEY BROOKE

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 AXIS PLEX 1 LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SCARLETT, ASHLEY BROOKE. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AXIS PLEX 1 LLC

Defendant

SCARLETT, ASHLEY BROOKE

Not Classified By Court

HUTSON SCARLETT, ASHLEY BROOKE

 

Court Documents

EVICTION COMPLAINT

10/08/2020:EVICTION COMPLAINT

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SCARLETT

10/08/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SCARLETT

RENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SCARLETT

10/08/2020:RENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SCARLETT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

10/08/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

10/08/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

10/08/2020:AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ASHLEY SCARLETT 10/13/20

10/15/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ASHLEY SCARLETT 10/13/20

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

10/22/2020:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

10/22/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ASHLEY SCARLETT 10/19/20

10/21/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ASHLEY SCARLETT 10/19/20

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

10/26/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/29/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANY AND ALL IN POSSESION 11/03/2020

11/04/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANY AND ALL IN POSSESION 11/03/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANY AND ALL IN POSSESION 11/03/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ASHLEY SCARLETT 10/19/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ASHLEY SCARLETT 10/13/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SCARLETT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: ASHLEY SCARLETT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number YX 170666

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketCase 452020CC000267CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/8/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketJudge: POOLE , WESLEY R assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less