This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 11/07/2020 at 13:32:14 (UTC).

AXIS PLEX 1 LLC VS BEVIS, BOBBIE JEAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 AXIS PLEX 1 LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BEVIS, BOBBIE JEAN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AXIS PLEX 1 LLC

Defendants

BEVIS, BOBBIE JEAN

ROTHENBURGH, TONYA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BOBBIE BEVIS

11/04/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BOBBIE BEVIS

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TONYA BOTHENBURGH

11/04/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TONYA BOTHENBURGH

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANY AND ALL IN POSSESION 11/03/2020

11/04/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANY AND ALL IN POSSESION 11/03/2020

WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/29/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION

FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

10/26/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

10/22/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

10/22/2020:MOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TONYA BOTHENBURGH

10/15/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TONYA BOTHENBURGH

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BOBBI BEVIS 10/13/20

10/15/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BOBBI BEVIS 10/13/20

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKAGE

10/08/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKAGE

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: TONYA ROTHENBURGH

10/08/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: TONYA ROTHENBURGH

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: BOBBIE BEVINS

10/08/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED: BOBBIE BEVINS

RENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: TONYA ROTHERNBURGH

10/08/2020:RENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: TONYA ROTHERNBURGH

RENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: BOBBIE BEVIS

10/08/2020:RENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: BOBBIE BEVIS

AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

10/08/2020:AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

10/08/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

10/08/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

EVICTION COMPLAINT

10/08/2020:EVICTION COMPLAINT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: BOBBIE BEVIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED: TONYA BOTHENBURGH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: ANY AND ALL IN POSSESION 11/03/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR CLERKS DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: TONYA BOTHENBURGH 10/13/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: BOBBI BEVIS 10/13/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING: EVICTION PACKAGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: TONYA ROTHERNBURGH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketRENT & DAMAGES SUMMONS ISSUED: BOBBIE BEVIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DAMAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketPayment received: $225.00 Receipt Number YX 170665

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketCase 452020CC000266CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 10/8/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketJudge: POOLE , WESLEY R assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less