This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/26/2019 at 13:30:51 (UTC).

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES VS SMITH, RONALD EDWARD

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES filed an Other lawsuit against SMITH, RONALD EDWARD. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendant

SMITH, RONALD EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUIR, DANIELA SOLORZANO

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

07/02/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/02/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

07/02/2019:MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RONALD SMITH

07/02/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RONALD SMITH

COVER SHEET

07/02/2019:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/02/2019:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

07/02/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED: RONALD SMITH

07/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: RONALD SMITH

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/15/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

07/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: RONALD SMITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 146668

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED RONALD SMITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000266CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 7/2/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less