This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 06/17/2022 at 01:15:06 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS SMITH, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed an Other lawsuit against SMITH, STEVEN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

SMITH, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKETT, BRETT HAROLD

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

04/05/2022:COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/05/2022:COMPLAINT

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/05/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/05/2022:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

04/05/2022:ORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

SUMMONS ISSUED: STEVEN SMITH

04/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: STEVEN SMITH

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEVEN SMITH 05/09/2022

05/11/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEVEN SMITH 05/09/2022

ORDER: APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

05/16/2022:ORDER: APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

05/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER: APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: STEVEN SMITH 05/09/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: STEVEN SMITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022

DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number YX 195038

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER SETTING CASE MGMT SCHEDULE FOR NJT- GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketCase 452022CC000114CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 4/5/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less