This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 10/10/2019 at 13:37:12 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS KIDD, TERESA S

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed an Other lawsuit against KIDD, TERESA S. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

KIDD, TERESA S

Not Classified By Court

KIDD, TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT ERIC

 

Court Documents

COVER SHEET

09/16/2019:COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TERESA KIDD

09/16/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TERESA KIDD

COMPLAINT

09/16/2019:COMPLAINT

MOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

10/08/2019:MOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

ORDER: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

10/09/2019:ORDER: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

 

Docket Entries

10/09/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION: FOR APPOINTMENT OF ELISOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: TERESA KIDD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TERESA KIDD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 151210

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019

DocketCase 452019CC000354CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less