This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County on 12/20/2019 at 14:31:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS GILLILAND, LAURIE

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GILLILAND, LAURIE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Nassau County

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

GILLILAND, LAURIE

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION PLTFS EX PARTE TO TRANSFER VENUE PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/05/2019:ORDER ON MOTION PLTFS EX PARTE TO TRANSFER VENUE PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED: LAURIE GILLILAND

12/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: LAURIE GILLILAND

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/12/2019:ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED: LAURIE GILLILAND

12/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: LAURIE GILLILAND

CORRESPONDENCE: FROM NICHOLAS THOMAS GADSON COUNTY FLORIDA

12/05/2019:CORRESPONDENCE: FROM NICHOLAS THOMAS GADSON COUNTY FLORIDA

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/12/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: LAURIE GILLILAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: LAURIE GILLILAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number YX 156482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE: FROM NICHOLAS THOMAS GADSON COUNTY FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON MOTION PLTFS EX PARTE TO TRANSFER VENUE PLTFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number YX 156125

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case 452019CA000507CAAXYX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.