This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 07/27/2022 at 15:40:29 (UTC).

ALVAREZ, DEBRA VS MESSER, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 ALVAREZ, DEBRA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MESSER, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Nassau County Historic Courthouse located in Nassau, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE, JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM and HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY SUZANNE

JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM

HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ, DEBRA

Defendant

MESSER, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED: CHRISTOPHER MESSER

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED: CHRISTOPHER MESSER

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

06/27/2022:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

06/27/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

PROOF OF CLAIM

06/27/2022:PROOF OF CLAIM

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

06/27/2022:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/27/2022:SC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CHRISTOPHER B. MESSER

07/01/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CHRISTOPHER B. MESSER

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2022

HearingEvent Date: 08/02/2022 09:00; Judge: HIGGINBOTHAM, JENNY; Docket Type: PRE; Location: JUDICIAL ANNEX ROBERT; Defendant Attorney: SE, PRO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: CHRISTOPHER B. MESSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSC STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: CHRISTOPHER MESSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketEvent PRE scheduled on 8/2/2022 at 0900 AM, YX - Judge JENNY HIGGINBOTHAM presiding.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number YX 198588

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2022

DocketCase 452022SC000350SCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 6/27/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less