This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/18/2019 at 16:41:28 (UTC).

ALMON, OLIVIA K VS ALMON, DEONDRE D

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 ALMON, OLIVIA K filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALMON, DEONDRE D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FAHLGREN, STEVEN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert M. Foster Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FAHLGREN, STEVEN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALMON, OLIVIA K

Respondent

ALMON, DEONDRE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SMITH, JENESSA J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: DEONDRE D ALMON 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • EMAIL: J. SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED: DEONDRE D ALMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Payment received: $418.00 Receipt Number YX 151955

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • MARRIAGE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER:

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Case 452019DR000876DRAXYX Filed with Clerk on 9/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less