This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 03/26/2019 at 18:23:24 (UTC).

ADVANCED ENVIROMENTAL TECHNOLO Et Al VS YAZJI, DEBBIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2009 ADVANCED ENVIROMENTAL TECHNOLO filed an Other lawsuit against YAZJI, DEBBIE. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURGESS, GRANVILLE C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURGESS, GRANVILLE C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHERN FOAM INSULATION INC

ADVANCED ENVIROMENTAL TECHNOLO

Defendants

YAZJI, DEBBIE

YAZJI, SAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIVERS, HUBERT BRYAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/17/2013

DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2013

DocketCLOSING ORDER OF DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2013

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2013

DocketNOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2012

DocketCAL: NOT OF HEARING MOT/TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2012

DocketCAL: NOT OF HEARING MOT/TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2012

DocketCORRESPONDENCE/MEMO FROM JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2012

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2012

DocketMTN: MOTION/APPEAR TELEPHONIC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2012

DocketORD: ORDER TO APPEAR TELEPHON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
01/04/2010

DocketNOT: OF LIS PENDENS REC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketASM: SUMMONS ISSUED SC CC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketOPN: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketSCANNED DOCUMENT OPEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2009

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2012

DocketEvent Date: 03/28/2012 11:00; Judge: BURGESS, GRANVILLE C; Docket Type: MOT; Location: YX O

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2010

DocketEvent Date: 06/23/2010 11:00; Judge: BURGESS, GRANVILLE C; Docket Type: MOT; Location: YX O

[+] Read More [-] Read Less