This case was last updated from Nassau County Florida Courts on 08/20/2020 at 12:03:53 (UTC).

121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION VS TOMKO, JAMIE ALLEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against TOMKO, JAMIE ALLEN. This case was filed in Nassau County Florida Courts, Robert M. Foster Justice Center located in Nassau, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is POOLE, WESLEY R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXYX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Nassau, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

POOLE, WESLEY R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

TOMKO, JAMIE ALLEN

TOMKO, MICHELLE DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

11/20/2019:COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/20/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JAMIE ALLEN TOMKO

12/16/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JAMIE ALLEN TOMKO

EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHELLE TOMKO

12/16/2019:EFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHELLE TOMKO

SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHELLE TOMKO

12/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: MICHELLE TOMKO

SUMMONS ISSUED: JAMIE TOMKO

12/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED: JAMIE TOMKO

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHELLE TOMKO 12/27/2019

12/31/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHELLE TOMKO 12/27/2019

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAMIE TOMKO 12/27/2019

12/31/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAMIE TOMKO 12/27/2019

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

01/13/2020:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE: J. POOLE

01/16/2020:CORRESPONDENCE: J. POOLE

FINAL JUDGMENT

01/16/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/20/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE: J. POOLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: JAMIE TOMKO 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: MICHELLE TOMKO 12/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: JAMIE TOMKO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED: MICHELLE TOMKO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHELLE TOMKO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JAMIE ALLEN TOMKO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number YX 156861

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $300.00 Receipt Number YX 155254

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCase 452019CC000453CCAXYX Filed with Clerk on 11/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 121 FINANCIAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L