This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/07/2019 at 15:03:21 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, LIDIA Et Al VS HERNANDEZ, CARLOS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 VASQUEZ, LIDIA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, CARLOS. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHLEEN ROBERTS and ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KATHLEEN ROBERTS

ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUEZ, LIDIA

VASQUEZ, RODOLFO

Defendants

HERNANDEZ, CARLOS

RODRIGUEZ, DAMARIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIMS, HOWARD KENNETH

 

Court Documents

SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE

02/28/2019:SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE

COURT MINUTES-2/28/19 @ 9:30AM-DEFENDANT'S TO VACATE BY 3/3/19 AT 5PM. ORDERS HANDED TO PARTIES IN COURT. EFILED TO CLERK:

02/28/2019:COURT MINUTES-2/28/19 @ 9:30AM-DEFENDANT'S TO VACATE BY 3/3/19 AT 5PM. ORDERS HANDED TO PARTIES IN COURT. EFILED TO CLERK:

ORDER TO VACATE PROPERTY-(2/28/19):

02/28/2019:ORDER TO VACATE PROPERTY-(2/28/19):

NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING 2.28.19 9:30AM:

02/14/2019:NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING 2.28.19 9:30AM:

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTORNEY HOWARD K. HEIMS DATED 2/7/19:

02/11/2019:LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTORNEY HOWARD K. HEIMS DATED 2/7/19:

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION)

02/07/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION)

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT; AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT ATTACHED

02/07/2019:NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT; AFFIDAVIT OF NON-PAYMENT ATTACHED

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CARLOS HERNANDEZ- NO ANSWER IN FILE:

02/05/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CARLOS HERNANDEZ- NO ANSWER IN FILE:

MOTION FOR DEFAULT: AS TO DEFENDANT, CARLOS HERNANDEZ, CT 1-POSSESSION

02/05/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT: AS TO DEFENDANT, CARLOS HERNANDEZ, CT 1-POSSESSION

FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON CARLOS HERNANDEZ ON 1/25/19 @ 5:43PM:

01/31/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON CARLOS HERNANDEZ ON 1/25/19 @ 5:43PM:

FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DAMARIS RODRIGUEZ ON 1/25/19 @ 5:43PM:

01/31/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DAMARIS RODRIGUEZ ON 1/25/19 @ 5:43PM:

ANSWER FILED BY TENANT:

01/29/2019:ANSWER FILED BY TENANT:

NOTICE OF FILING NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

01/28/2019:NOTICE OF FILING NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

NOTICE OF FILING NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

01/28/2019:NOTICE OF FILING NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

COMBINED 5-20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAMARIS RODRIGUEZ AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/24/2019:COMBINED 5-20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAMARIS RODRIGUEZ AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

COMBINED 5-20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARLOS RODRIGUEZ AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/24/2019:COMBINED 5-20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARLOS RODRIGUEZ AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED COMBINED 5/20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

01/23/2019:PROPOSED COMBINED 5/20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Updated Event MOTION HEARING on 2/28/2019 0930 AM Judge KATHLEEN ROBERTS results DISPOSED on 2/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT MINUTES-2/28/19 @ 9:30AM-DEFENDANT'S TO VACATE BY 3/3/19 AT 5PM. ORDERS HANDED TO PARTIES IN COURT. EFILED TO CLERK:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO VACATE PROPERTY-(2/28/19):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 2/28/2019 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge KATHLEEN ROBERTS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING 2.28.19 9:30AM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • CLERK'S NOTES: UNSIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ALONG WITH WRIT OF POSSESSION AND CHECK #43636 IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00 RETURNED TO ATTORNEY WITH COPY OF LETTER: PER JUDGE CASE CAN BE SET FOR HEARING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTORNEY HOWARD K. HEIMS DATED 2/7/19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (RESIDENTIAL EVICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMBINED 5-20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAMARIS RODRIGUEZ AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMBINED 5-20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CARLOS RODRIGUEZ AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED COMBINED 5/20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED COMBINED 5/20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case 432019CC000113CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Event Date: 02/28/2019 09:30; Judge: ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: MX A2-3

    Read MoreRead Less