This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:38:02 (UTC).

UHLE, JOHN VS MOOREHEAD, ANITA

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 UHLE, JOHN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOOREHEAD, ANITA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UHLE, JOHN

Defendant

MOOREHEAD, ANITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBERST, JONATHON THOMPSON

Defendant Attorney

COYLE, NATASHA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET :

01/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET :

CIVIL COVER SHEET :

01/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET :

COMPLAINT :

01/30/2019:COMPLAINT :

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ANITA MOOREHEAD:

01/30/2019:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ANITA MOOREHEAD:

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ANITA MOOREHEAD:

01/30/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ANITA MOOREHEAD:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ANITA MOOREHEAD:

01/30/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ANITA MOOREHEAD:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - ANITA MOOREHEAD- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - ANITA MOOREHEAD- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

01/31/2019:NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

02/22/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/22/2019:ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JOHN UHLE, 6.13.19 AT 10A

02/22/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JOHN UHLE, 6.13.19 AT 10A

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOHN UHLE

02/22/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOHN UHLE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/22/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, JOHN UHLE

02/22/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, JOHN UHLE

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS:

02/26/2019:PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS:

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF, JOHN UHLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOHN UHLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF JOHN UHLE, 6.13.19 AT 10A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - ANITA MOOREHEAD- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ANITA MOOREHEAD:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ANITA MOOREHEAD:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ANITA MOOREHEAD:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Case 432019CA000128CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EBERST, JONATHON THOMPSON