This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:51:51 (UTC).

UDELL, SPENCER LEE VS LAVETER, MATHEW

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 UDELL, SPENCER LEE filed an Other lawsuit against LAVETER, MATHEW. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UDELL, SPENCER LEE

Defendant

LAVETER, MATHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GRAZI, RYAN SANFORD

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES:

03/07/2019:DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES:

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND

03/06/2019:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND

NOTICE OF DESIGNATED PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS IN COMPLAINCE WITH MANDATORY EMAIL SERVICE RULE:

03/06/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATED PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS IN COMPLAINCE WITH MANDATORY EMAIL SERVICE RULE:

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT:

03/04/2019:DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT:

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF PRIMARTY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESS IN COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY E-MAIL SERVICE RULE:

03/04/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF PRIMARTY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESS IN COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY E-MAIL SERVICE RULE:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-RYAN S GRAZI ESQ ON BEHALF OF MATHEW LAVETER:

03/04/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-RYAN S GRAZI ESQ ON BEHALF OF MATHEW LAVETER:

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT:

02/25/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT:

RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED UPON MATTHEW LAVETER ON 02.13.2019 AT 11:55 AM; SUMMONS ATTACHED

02/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED UPON MATTHEW LAVETER ON 02.13.2019 AT 11:55 AM; SUMMONS ATTACHED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATED PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS IN COMPLAINCE WITH MANDATORY EMAIL SERVICE RULE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OF PRIMARTY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESS IN COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY E-MAIL SERVICE RULE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE-RYAN S GRAZI ESQ ON BEHALF OF MATHEW LAVETER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED UPON MATTHEW LAVETER ON 02.13.2019 AT 11:55 AM; SUMMONS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • LETTER TO SPENCER LEE UDELL FROM CLERK DATED 2.11.19 RE: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO- MATHEW LAVETER- MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF CIVIL WITH CERTIFIED COPY OF APPLICATION OF INDIGENCE::

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION TO STOP DISPERSANTS OF ASSETS BY DEFENDANT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • CIVIL COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Case 432019CA000157CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Judge: ROBY , WILLIAM L assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAZI, RYAN S