This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:38:15 (UTC).

STUCK, ULRIKE VS BIDDLE, MARJORIE C Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 STUCK, ULRIKE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BIDDLE, MARJORIE C. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUCK, ULRIKE

Defendants

THOMPSON BIDDLE, DAVID ALLEN J

BIDDLE, MARJORIE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARACUZZO, JOHN ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED SUBSTITUTE TO DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR FOR MARJORIE C. BIDDLE 2.5.19:

02/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED SUBSTITUTE TO DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR FOR MARJORIE C. BIDDLE 2.5.19:

RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED SUMMONS ON DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE 2.5.19:

02/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED SUMMONS ON DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE 2.5.19:

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

01/31/2019:NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO - DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR & MAJORIE C BIDDLE- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO - DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR & MAJORIE C BIDDLE- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MARJORIE C BIDDLE:

01/30/2019:PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MARJORIE C BIDDLE:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR:

01/30/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR:

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT MARJORIE C BIDDLE:

01/30/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT MARJORIE C BIDDLE:

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT MAJORIE C BIDDLE:

01/30/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT MAJORIE C BIDDLE:

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR:

01/30/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR:

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT DAVID ALLEN THOMAS BIDDLE JR:

01/30/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT DAVID ALLEN THOMAS BIDDLE JR:

COMPLAINT :

01/30/2019:COMPLAINT :

CIVIL COVER SHEET :

01/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET :

CIVIL COVER SHEET :

01/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET :

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED SUBSTITUTE TO DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR FOR MARJORIE C. BIDDLE 2.5.19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE: SERVED SUMMONS ON DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE 2.5.19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO - DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR & MAJORIE C BIDDLE- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MARJORIE C BIDDLE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT MARJORIE C BIDDLE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT MAJORIE C BIDDLE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DAVID ALLEN THOMPSON BIDDLE JR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT DAVID ALLEN THOMAS BIDDLE JR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Case 432019CA000127CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARACUZZO, JOHN ALEXANDER