This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/07/2019 at 15:26:57 (UTC).

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I VS NEECE, ANGELA RENEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I filed an Other lawsuit against NEECE, ANGELA RENEE. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE I

Defendants

NEECE, BRETT THOMAS

NEECE, ANGELA RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NODARSE-BUSCEMI, ODALYS

 

Court Documents

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANGELA RENEE NEECE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

02/08/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANGELA RENEE NEECE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ANGELA RENNE NEECE:

02/07/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ANGELA RENNE NEECE:

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRETT THOMAS NEECE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

02/06/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRETT THOMAS NEECE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

02/05/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

COMPLAINT

02/05/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANGELA RENEE NEECE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ANGELA RENNE NEECE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO BRETT THOMAS NEECE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • CLERK'S NOTES: ONLY ONE SUMMONS SUBMITTED AT TIME OF FILING-PER ATTORNEY'S REQUEST SUMMONS FOR ANGELA RENEE NEECE WILL BE SUBMITTED SEPARATELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Case 432019CC000191CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less