This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 07/07/2019 at 14:46:30 (UTC).

STANGE, JANE VS MILLER, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 STANGE, JANE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILLER, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBY, WILLIAM L and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBY, WILLIAM L

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STANGE, JANE

Defendant

MILLER, MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

GOODRICH, JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADDEN, JOHN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND FOR BEING BARRED BY THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS:

06/28/2019:DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND FOR BEING BARRED BY THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS:

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS:

06/28/2019:NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS:

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/13/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MICHAEL MILLER; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE:

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MICHAEL MILLER; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO MICHAEL MILLER:

06/13/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO MICHAEL MILLER:

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND FOR BEING BARRED BY THE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: MICHAEL MILLER; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO MICHAEL MILLER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case 432019CA000758CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.