This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 04/06/2019 at 17:45:53 (UTC).

SPECIALTY HEALTH ASSOCIATES LL VS ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 SPECIALTY HEALTH ASSOCIATES LL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNIFER WATERS and WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNIFER WATERS

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALTY HEALTH ASSOCIATES LL

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLANAGAN, THOMAS E

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY UPON ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03.22.2019; SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED

03/22/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY UPON ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03.22.2019; SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 4.30.19 AT 9 AM

03/13/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 4.30.19 AT 9 AM

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/13/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

03/13/2019:PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

COMPLAINT

03/13/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY ELECTRONIC DELIVERY UPON ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03.22.2019; SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 4/30/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JENNIFER WATERS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 4.30.19 AT 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Case 432019SC000453SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Event Date: 04/30/2019 09:00; Judge: WATERS, JENNIFER; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX A2-1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECIALTY HEALTH ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLANAGAN, THOMAS E III