This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 06/10/2019 at 18:45:32 (UTC).

SMITH, TERRI A VS SMITH, STEPHEN W

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 SMITH, TERRI A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SMITH, STEPHEN W. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J and MICHAEL MCNICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J

MICHAEL MCNICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, TERRI A

Respondent

SMITH, STEPHEN W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEGER, KAREN O'BRIEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING 6.19.2019 AT 830 AM- FINAL HEARING OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Event FINAL HEARING-DISS scheduled on 6/19/2019 at 0830 AM, MX - Judge MICHAEL MCNICHOLAS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • STANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • STANDING ORDER OF REFERRAL TO PARENT EDUCATION CLASSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - STEPHEN W SMITH:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • APPEARANCE, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, ANSWER, CONSENT AND WAIVER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FILED BY ATTORNEY KAREN STEGER ON BEHALF OF TERRI A SMITH:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - TERRI SMITH- SIGNED ON 5/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Case 432019DR000368DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less