This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 04/25/2019 at 19:45:39 (UTC).

SMITH, EDMOND, SMITH, HOYT Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 SMITH, EDMOND, SMITH, HOYT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Trustee

SMITH, EDMOND

Decedent

SMITH, HOYT

Not Classified By Court

HOYT SMITH TRUST,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BURSON, ROBERT AUSTIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • RECORDED DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • COPY OF MEMO TO ATTORNEYS OFFICE REGARDING COPY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE - HOYT SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO THE CLERK DATED 04/01/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL WILL BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • COPY OF PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Case 432019CP000246CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less