This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:37:46 (UTC).

SEGURA, GALUD VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 SEGURA, GALUD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEGURA, GALUD

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

QIU, MENGJUN

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION FOR SERVICE OD COURT:

02/05/2019:DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION FOR SERVICE OD COURT:

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6):

02/05/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6):

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: TO DEFENDANT:

02/05/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: TO DEFENDANT:

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT:

02/05/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY:

02/05/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

02/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES:

02/21/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES:

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF'S:

02/21/2019:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF'S:

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM-GALUD SEGURA:

03/02/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM-GALUD SEGURA:

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM-STUART HYMSON:

03/02/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM-STUART HYMSON:

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION-STUART HYMSON, PUBLIC ADJUSTER:

03/02/2019:SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION-STUART HYMSON, PUBLIC ADJUSTER:

NOTICE OF SERVING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1351:

03/02/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1351:

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

03/06/2019:UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

03/06/2019:UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ON STUART HYMSON 3.5.19( NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED):

03/07/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ON STUART HYMSON 3.5.19( NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED):

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ON STUART HYMSON 3.5.19( NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1351:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITION-STUART HYMSON, PUBLIC ADJUSTER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM-STUART HYMSON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM-GALUD SEGURA:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF'S:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: TO DEFENDANT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION FOR SERVICE OD COURT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Case 432019CA000126CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Qiu, Mengjun