This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 05/12/2019 at 19:45:41 (UTC).

ROCHE, ANNE E, ROCHE, GERARD R Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 ROCHE, ANNE E, ROCHE, GERARD R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

ROCHE, ANNE E

Decedent

ROCHE, GERARD R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COPELAND, SUSAN LAWTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE- GERARD R. ROCHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO THE CLERK DATED 04/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Case 432019CP000306CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less