This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 05/25/2019 at 12:45:55 (UTC).

RICHARD BYRD VS DEBOE, APRIL

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 RICHARD BYRD filed an Other lawsuit against DEBOE, APRIL. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD BYRD

Defendant

DEBOE, APRIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

05/23/2019:DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON APRIL DEOBE ON 5/9/19 @ 10:07AM:

05/11/2019:20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON APRIL DEOBE ON 5/9/19 @ 10:07AM:

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO APRIL DEBOE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

05/07/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO APRIL DEBOE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

05/06/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

05/06/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

COMPLAINT

05/06/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/06/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON APRIL DEOBE ON 5/9/19 @ 10:07AM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO APRIL DEBOE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case 432019CC000807CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less