This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 07/07/2019 at 14:46:51 (UTC).

REINHART AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RI VS REINHART, CRAIG R

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 REINHART AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REINHART, CRAIG R. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REINHART AS TRUSTEE FOR THE RI

Defendant

REINHART, CRAIG R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADFORD, LYMAN SHERWOOD

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (SENT TO RECORDING WITH $9 RECEIPT)

07/03/2019:AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (SENT TO RECORDING WITH $9 RECEIPT)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CRAIG R REINHART; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE:

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CRAIG R REINHART; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO CRAIG R. REINHART:

06/13/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO CRAIG R. REINHART:

VERIFIED COMPLAINT: FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF:

06/13/2019:VERIFIED COMPLAINT: FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF:

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

06/13/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (SENT TO RECORDING WITH $9 RECEIPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • CLERK'S NOTE - LIS PENDENS AND RECEIPT SENT TO RECORDING-AY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: CRAIG R REINHART; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO CRAIG R. REINHART:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT: FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case 432019CA000759CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less