This case was last updated from Martin County Florida Courts on 02/10/2023 at 18:09:44 (UTC).

PINELAKE VILLAGE INC vs. HERMAN, ESTATE

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 PINELAKE VILLAGE INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERMAN, ESTATE. This case was filed in Martin County Florida Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PINELAKE VILLAGE INC

Pinelake Village Mobile Home Park

Defendant

ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINDEN, JON ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

12/12/2022: PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #220038214

12/12/2022: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #220038214

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION

12/12/2022: COMPLAINT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION

FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUEDTO ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

12/13/2022: FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUEDTO ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/16/2022: CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

12/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ESTATE OF GLADYU'S HERMAN-12-16-22

12/27/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ESTATE OF GLADYU'S HERMAN-12-16-22

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST ESTATE OF GLADY'S HERMAN

12/27/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST ESTATE OF GLADY'S HERMAN

DEFAULT ISSUED AS TO THE ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN - NO ANSWER ON FILE

12/29/2022: DEFAULT ISSUED AS TO THE ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN - NO ANSWER ON FILE

MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION:

12/29/2022: MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION:

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

1/3/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION; SIGNED 1.3.23

1/3/2023: FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION; SIGNED 1.3.23

FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION; SIGNED 1.3.23 - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/10/2023 10:18 AM / INSTRUMENT #: 2996997 BOOK#:3353 PAGE#: 2955)

1/14/2023: FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION; SIGNED 1.3.23 - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/10/2023 10:18 AM / INSTRUMENT #: 2996997 BOOK#:3353 PAGE#: 2955)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO SHERIFF CIVIL WITH $90 CHECK

1/18/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO SHERIFF CIVIL WITH $90 CHECK

MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE TO ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN WITH EVICTION COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ATTACHED

1/20/2023: MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE TO ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN WITH EVICTION COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ATTACHED

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ESTATE OF LADYS HERMAN AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ON 01.24.23

1/30/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ESTATE OF LADYS HERMAN AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ON 01.24.23

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ESTATE OF LADYS HERMAN AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ON 01.24.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE TO ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN WITH EVICTION COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO SHERIFF CIVIL WITH $90 CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION; SIGNED 1.3.23 - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/10/2023 10:18 AM / INSTRUMENT #: 2996997 BOOK#:3353 PAGE#: 2955)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION; SIGNED 1.3.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ISSUED AS TO THE ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN - NO ANSWER ON FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND PROPOSED CLERKS DEFAULT AGAINST ESTATE OF GLADY'S HERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK - CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUEDTO ESTATE OF GLADYS HERMAN AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 220038214; Applied Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #220038214

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MOBILE HOME TENANT EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketLANDLORD TENANT ACTION ASSESSED $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/12/2022 CASE NUMBER 22002031CCAXMX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less