This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/25/2019 at 12:46:23 (UTC).

MOUGDIS, NICKOLAOS VS GREENBIRD, INDIA CHEYENNE

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 MOUGDIS, NICKOLAOS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GREENBIRD, INDIA CHEYENNE. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOUGDIS, NICKOLAOS

Defendant

GREENBIRD, INDIA CHEYENNE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MCSO WITH A $90.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

03/20/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MCSO WITH A $90.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

FINAL JUDGMENT/ SIGNED 3/18/19:

03/19/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT/ SIGNED 3/18/19:

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT:

03/15/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT:

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD- NO ANSWER IN FILE:

03/15/2019:MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD- NO ANSWER IN FILE:

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

03/15/2019:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD ON 3/5/19 @ 1:30PM:

03/08/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD ON 3/5/19 @ 1:30PM:

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

03/04/2019:CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD AND HAND DELIVERED TO CIVIL SHERIFF WITH $40 RECEIPT

03/04/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD AND HAND DELIVERED TO CIVIL SHERIFF WITH $40 RECEIPT

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION:

03/04/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION:

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/04/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MCSO WITH A $90.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT/ SIGNED 3/18/19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • CLERK'S NOTES: FINAL JUDGMENT SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ISSUED AGAINST INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD- NO ANSWER IN FILE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD ON 3/5/19 @ 1:30PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO INDIA CHEYENNE GREENBIRD AND HAND DELIVERED TO CIVIL SHERIFF WITH $40 RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Case 432019CC000391CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less