This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 04/18/2019 at 12:45:30 (UTC).

MM IRIS PROPERTIES LLC VS JOHNSON, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 MM IRIS PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON, STEVEN. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MM IRIS PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

JOHNSON, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HIBBERD, BLAINE HARRIS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 4/9/19 @ 2:00PM:

04/10/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 4/9/19 @ 2:00PM:

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE WITH A $40.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

04/05/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE WITH A $40.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION/ SIGNED 4/5/19:

04/05/2019:JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION/ SIGNED 4/5/19:

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF:

04/04/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF:

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY STATUS- STEVEN JOHNSON:

04/04/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY STATUS- STEVEN JOHNSON:

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION:

04/04/2019:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION:

MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT- GRANTED- STEVEN JOHNSON- NO ANSWER FILED:

04/03/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT- GRANTED- STEVEN JOHNSON- NO ANSWER FILED:

MOTION FOR DEFAULT-PROPOSED DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON:

04/03/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT-PROPOSED DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON:

MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON- DENIED- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED TO EARLY- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

04/02/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON- DENIED- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED TO EARLY- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ PROPOSED DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON:

04/02/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ PROPOSED DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON:

FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED STEVEN JOHNSON 3.26.19 (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING):

04/01/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED STEVEN JOHNSON 3.26.19 (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING):

FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVEN JOHNSON AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

03/26/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVEN JOHNSON AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

03/25/2019:PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/25/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

03/25/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 4/9/19 @ 2:00PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE WITH A $40.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION/ SIGNED 4/5/19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY STATUS- STEVEN JOHNSON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT- GRANTED- STEVEN JOHNSON- NO ANSWER FILED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT-PROPOSED DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT-DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON- DENIED- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FILED TO EARLY- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ PROPOSED DEFAULT- STEVEN JOHNSON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED STEVEN JOHNSON 3.26.19 (ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVEN JOHNSON AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Case 432019CC000536CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less