This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 07/27/2019 at 16:15:48 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS DAVIS, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVIS, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNIFER WATERS and WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNIFER WATERS

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

DAVIS, JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER DAVIS AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 9.3.19 AT 9AM

07/26/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER DAVIS AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 9.3.19 AT 9AM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/25/2019:COMPLAINT

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

07/25/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/3/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JENNIFER WATERS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO JENNIFER DAVIS AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 9.3.19 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Case 432019SC001286SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less