This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:29:08 (UTC).

MIAN, BUSHRA S Et Al VS HOBE, ROBERT D

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 MIAN, BUSHRA S filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOBE, ROBERT D. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIAN, BUSHRA S

RAMQUAR, RENIEZ KEN

Defendant

HOBE, ROBERT D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALI, THOMAS JOHN

Defendant Attorney

BEDARD, BENJAMIN LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE FOR MARCH 7, 2019 @ 2:00 PM:

03/06/2019:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE FOR MARCH 7, 2019 @ 2:00 PM:

DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF BUSHRA S. MIAN:

02/19/2019:DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF BUSHRA S. MIAN:

DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATOIRES TO PLAINTIFF RENIEZ KEN RAMQUAR:

02/19/2019:DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATOIRES TO PLAINTIFF RENIEZ KEN RAMQUAR:

DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF BUSHRA S. MIAN:

02/19/2019:DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF BUSHRA S. MIAN:

DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF RENIEZ RAMQUAR:

02/19/2019:DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF RENIEZ RAMQUAR:

DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

02/19/2019:DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/07/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: (BENJAMIN L. BEDARD: 03.15.2019-03.25.2019; 04.11.2019-04.16.2019; 05.16.2019-05.20.2019; 07.15.2019-07.29.2019:

02/07/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: (BENJAMIN L. BEDARD: 03.15.2019-03.25.2019; 04.11.2019-04.16.2019; 05.16.2019-05.20.2019; 07.15.2019-07.29.2019:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/07/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON ROBERT D. HOBE ON 03.07.2019 AT 2:00 PM:

02/06/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON ROBERT D. HOBE ON 03.07.2019 AT 2:00 PM:

EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE - SUMMONS RETURNED TO AND ACCEPTED BY ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/24/2019:EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE - SUMMONS RETURNED TO AND ACCEPTED BY ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - ROBERT D HOBE; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - ROBERT D HOBE; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ROBERT D HOBE

01/24/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ROBERT D HOBE

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/24/2019:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/24/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

01/24/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

COMPLAINT

01/24/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE FOR MARCH 7, 2019 @ 2:00 PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF BUSHRA S. MIAN:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATOIRES TO PLAINTIFF RENIEZ KEN RAMQUAR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF BUSHRA S. MIAN:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF RENIEZ RAMQUAR:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, ROBERT D. HOBE'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: (BENJAMIN L. BEDARD: 03.15.2019-03.25.2019; 04.11.2019-04.16.2019; 05.16.2019-05.20.2019; 07.15.2019-07.29.2019:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED UPON ROBERT D HOBE ON 01.30.2019 AT 8:20AM; SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ON ROBERT D. HOBE ON 03.07.2019 AT 2:00 PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE - SUMMONS RETURNED TO AND ACCEPTED BY ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - ROBERT D HOBE; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- ROBERT D HOBE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case 432019CA000091CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEDARD, BENJAMIN LAWRENCE