This case was last updated from Martin County Florida Courts on 01/26/2023 at 16:27:00 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. ADONA, RICO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADONA, RICO. This case was filed in Martin County Florida Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ADONA, RICO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN, JOSHUA MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

1/12/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

1/12/2023: PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

1/12/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #230001397

1/12/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #230001397

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICO ADONA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 02.28.2023 AT 9 AM

1/13/2023: PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICO ADONA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 02.28.2023 AT 9 AM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY SUBSTITUTE-RICO ADONA 1-23-23

1/25/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY SUBSTITUTE-RICO ADONA 1-23-23

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: WATERS, JENNIFER; Location: SECOND FLOOR ROOM 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY SUBSTITUTE-RICO ADONA 1-23-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPRE TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/28/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN A2-1, JDG: WATERS, JENNIFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICO ADONA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 02.28.2023 AT 9 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 230001397; Applied Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #230001397

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCLAIMS $2500.01-$15000 ASSESSED $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/12/2023 CASE NUMBER 23000050SCAXMX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less