This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 04/17/2019 at 14:05:42 (UTC).

KALBFLEISCH, HAROLD M, KALBFLEISCH, KIRK H Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 KALBFLEISCH, HAROLD M, KALBFLEISCH, KIRK H was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Decedent

KALBFLEISCH, HAROLD M

Not Classified By Court

KALBFLEISCH, KIRK H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WOOD, STEVEN JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • VERIFIED INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS ON THE AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION AND NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • COPY REQUEST PROCESSED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • COPY REQUEST RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2019
  • LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL WILL BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case 432019CP000013CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less