This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:37:35 (UTC).

IRVINE AS SURVIVING SPOUSE AND VS 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 IRVINE AS SURVIVING SPOUSE AND filed an Other lawsuit against 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVINE AS SURVIVING SPOUSE AND

Defendants

HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS INC

NY VENTURE 64 LLC

23 NE MACARTHUR LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLAM, CHRIS W

Defendant Attorney

HERNANDEZ, EDWARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: FILED BY EDWARD HERNANDEZ:

03/07/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: FILED BY EDWARD HERNANDEZ:

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN IRVINE:

03/07/2019:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN IRVINE:

DEFENDANTS, NY VENTURE # 64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING WRONGFUL DEATH INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF:

03/06/2019:DEFENDANTS, NY VENTURE # 64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING WRONGFUL DEATH INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF:

DEFENDANTS, NY VENTURE # 64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF:

03/06/2019:DEFENDANTS, NY VENTURE # 64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF:

DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION:

02/21/2019:DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION:

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN IRVINE ON 04.29.2019 AT 10:00 AM:

02/21/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN IRVINE ON 04.29.2019 AT 10:00 AM:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/21/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT, 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

02/21/2019:DEFENDANT, 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

02/21/2019:DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC. ONLY:

02/13/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC. ONLY:

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC:

01/31/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC:

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC:

01/31/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC:

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC:

01/31/2019:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC:

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

01/30/2019:NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: -NY VENTURE #64, LLC, 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC, AND TO HOMEAWAY HOLDING, INC; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: -NY VENTURE #64, LLC, 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC, AND TO HOMEAWAY HOLDING, INC; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO - NY VENTURE #64, LLC

01/30/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO - NY VENTURE #64, LLC

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC

01/30/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC

01/30/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY: FILED BY EDWARD HERNANDEZ:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN IRVINE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS, NY VENTURE # 64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING WRONGFUL DEATH INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANTS, NY VENTURE # 64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC AND 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MAUREEN IRVINE ON 04.29.2019 AT 10:00 AM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, NY VENTURE #64, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO dismissed 2/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, 23 NE MACARTHUR LLC:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: -NY VENTURE #64, LLC, 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC, AND TO HOMEAWAY HOLDING, INC; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO - NY VENTURE #64, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- 23 NE MACARTHUR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Case 432019CA000125CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOMEAWAY HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRIS KELLAM