This case was last updated from Martin County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/19/2023 at 18:03:36 (UTC).

HERRERA, JOSE L vs. IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 HERRERA, JOSE L filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Martin County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERRERA, JOSE L

IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC

Defendants and Plaintiffs

IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC

AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC

RINDER, LEWIS

RINDER, COLLEEN

Not Classified By Court

GN SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MCBRIDE, PAUL WILLIAM

SHALHOUB, PAUL R

TUZZIO, GERARD A

MARTINEZ, SHAHLA K

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF JOSE L HERRERA:

3/17/2023: DEFENDANT IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF JOSE L HERRERA:

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY-PAUL R. SHALHOUB, ESQ.:

3/10/2023: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY-PAUL R. SHALHOUB, ESQ.:

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

3/7/2023: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GN SYSTEMS, INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

2/22/2023: THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, GN SYSTEMS, INC.S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES: CLAIRE ARMAGNAC-RODRIGUEZ, ESQ. OF RESNICK & LOUIS, P.S.

2/21/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES: CLAIRE ARMAGNAC-RODRIGUEZ, ESQ. OF RESNICK & LOUIS, P.S.

DEFENDANTS', IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JOSE HERRERA

2/17/2023: DEFENDANTS', IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JOSE HERRERA

DEFENDANTS', IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF JOSE HERRERA

2/17/2023: DEFENDANTS', IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF JOSE HERRERA

DEFENDANTS', IVY H. SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

2/10/2023: DEFENDANTS', IVY H. SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DEFENDANT'S, AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC, ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/7/2023: DEFENDANT'S, AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC, ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANTS', IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF JOSE HERRERA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS', IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF JOSE HERRERA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS', IVY H. SMITH COMPANY LLC AND AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S, AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC, ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & NOTICE OF E-MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATIONS: PAUL R. SHALHOUB, ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UPON IVY H. SMITH COMPANY ON 12.27.2022; SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UPON AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC ON 12.27.2022; SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 230002049; Applied Amount: $405.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED TO GN SYSTEMS INC- RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA EPORTAL:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $405.00 RECEIPT #230002049

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT IVY H SMITH COMPANY LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNEW CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/21/2022 CASE NUMBER 22001081CAAXMX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less