This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 07/27/2019 at 16:15:19 (UTC).

GRIFFIN, SHARON VS BAKER & ZIMMERMAN PA

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 GRIFFIN, SHARON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAKER ZIMMERMAN PA. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNIFER WATERS and WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNIFER WATERS

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIFFIN, SHARON

Defendant

BAKER & ZIMMERMAN PA

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO BAKER & ZIMMERMAN PA AND MAILED TO BROWARD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE WITH NOTICE OF HEARING SET 0N 9.3.19 AT 9AM WITH $40 CERTIFIED CHECK AND RETURN OF SERVICE. COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

07/26/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO BAKER & ZIMMERMAN PA AND MAILED TO BROWARD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE WITH NOTICE OF HEARING SET 0N 9.3.19 AT 9AM WITH $40 CERTIFIED CHECK AND RETURN OF SERVICE. COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

07/25/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 9/3/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JENNIFER WATERS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO BAKER & ZIMMERMAN PA AND MAILED TO BROWARD COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE WITH NOTICE OF HEARING SET 0N 9.3.19 AT 9AM WITH $40 CERTIFIED CHECK AND RETURN OF SERVICE. COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Case 432019SC001284SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less