This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 05/16/2019 at 18:46:56 (UTC).

GLASS, JUANITA VS GLASS, DONALD

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 GLASS, JUANITA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GLASS, DONALD. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J and MICHAEL MCNICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J

MICHAEL MCNICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GLASS, JUANITA

Respondent

GLASS, DONALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Event FINAL HEARING-DISS scheduled on 5/29/2019 at 0300 PM, MX - Judge MICHAEL MCNICHOLAS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING 5.29.19 AT 3:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • STANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- JUANITA GLASS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- DONALD GLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- DONALD GLASS 04.16.2019:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- JUANITA GLASS 04.15.2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • ANSWER,WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS- APPROVED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Case 432019DR000303DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Judge: MCNICHOLAS , MICHAEL J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less