This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/07/2019 at 14:38:19 (UTC).

GEMAIRE DISTRIBUTORS LLC VS J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY I

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 GEMAIRE DISTRIBUTORS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY I. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNIFER WATERS and WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNIFER WATERS

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEMAIRE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

Defendant

J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY I

Not Classified By Court

J&J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEFFLER, SCOTT STEVEN

 

Court Documents

JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE:

02/25/2019:JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE:

20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC BY SERVING ELSA SANCHEZ ON 1/7/19 @ 2:30PM:

02/15/2019:20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC BY SERVING ELSA SANCHEZ ON 1/7/19 @ 2:30PM:

SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE

02/14/2019:SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE

MOTION TO DISMISS DUE TO IMPROPER SERVICE:

02/13/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS DUE TO IMPROPER SERVICE:

ORDER ON DEFENDANT, J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC, MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING / SIGNED 2/11/19:

02/11/2019:ORDER ON DEFENDANT, J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC, MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING / SIGNED 2/11/19:

DEFENDANT , J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PAYMENT:

02/11/2019:DEFENDANT , J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PAYMENT:

NOTICE OF HEARING -2/14/19 @ 1:30PM- DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE:

02/11/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING -2/14/19 @ 1:30PM- DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE:

DEFENDANT J & J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY, INC., MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

02/05/2019:DEFENDANT J & J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY, INC., MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING

DEFENDANT, J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY, INC, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

02/05/2019:DEFENDANT, J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY, INC, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

02/05/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING/ SIGNED 1/31/19:

01/31/2019:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING/ SIGNED 1/31/19:

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING:

01/28/2019:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING:

NOTICE OF HEARING 2.14.19 1:30PM - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

01/28/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING 2.14.19 1:30PM - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

01/22/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/04/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

01/04/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

COMPLAINT

01/04/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/04/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC BY SERVING ELSA SANCHEZ ON 1/7/19 @ 2:30PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Updated Event MOTION HEARING on 2/14/2019 0130 PM Judge JENNIFER WATERS results DISPOSED on 2/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT MINUTES-2/14/19 @1:30PM-BOTH PARTIES APPEARED TELEPHONICALLY: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS- GRANTED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART: MEDIATION ORDERED WITHIN 45 DAYS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE - SIGNED 2.14.19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS DUE TO IMPROPER SERVICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON DEFENDANT, J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC, MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING / SIGNED 2/11/19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT , J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PAYMENT:

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING 2.14.19 1:30PM - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC BY SERVING ELSA SANCHEZ ON 1/7/19 @ 2:30PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO J AND J REFRIGERATION SUPPLY INC AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Case 432019CC000024CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Event Date: 02/14/2019 13:30; Judge: WATERS, JENNIFER; Docket Type: MOTION HEARING; Location: MX A2-1

    Read MoreRead Less