This case was last updated from Martin County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/29/2023 at 18:24:47 (UTC).

GARCIA, ALICIA vs. TOWERHILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 GARCIA, ALICIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWERHILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Martin County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA, ALICE

Defendant

TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLESTER, MINDY

Defendant Attorneys

FLICKSTEIN, AUSTIN

WAHAB, CHAFIC

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN AVOIDANCE OF DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

1/24/2023: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN AVOIDANCE OF DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/13/2023: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

1/13/2023: DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

1/13/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/5/2023: DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

1/5/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

1/5/2023: DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

12/22/2022: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES- CHAFIC WAHAB FOR DEFENDANT

12/6/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES- CHAFIC WAHAB FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION- MINDY MCLESTER FOR PLAINTIFF

12/5/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION- MINDY MCLESTER FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/5/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY- RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA EPORTAL:

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED TO TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY- RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA EPORTAL:

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #220036858

11/30/2022: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #220036858

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 AS TO TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

11/30/2022: PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 AS TO TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

11/30/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

11/30/2022: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/30/2022: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/30/2022: COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN AVOIDANCE OF DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESSES- CHAFIC WAHAB FOR DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION- MINDY MCLESTER FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #220036858

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 AS TO TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNEW CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/30/2022 CASE NUMBER 22001016CAAXMX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less